Melendez-Vidaurre v. Gonzalez-Cebollero
Plaintiff: Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre
Defendant: William Gonzalez-Cebollero
Case Number: 3:2018cv01947
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre trough USMS upon William Gonzalez-Cebollero served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (mr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William Gonzalez-Cebollero. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #1 "Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis." The Marshals shall serve process upon defendant accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/27/2018. (EMJ)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against William Gonzalez-Cebollero, filed by Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre, Pro Se. Service due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre, Pro Se. (rim)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion To Proceed)(rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez-Vidaurre v. Gonzalez-Cebollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gildo Julio Melendez-Vidaurre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gonzalez-Cebollero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?