Diaz v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Isidoro Diaz
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01948
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isidoro Diaz upon United States of America served on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isidoro Diaz upon United States of America served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Iguina-Gonzalez, Antonio) Modified on 1/8/2019 to correct answer due date (mr).
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (vdm)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6180084.), filed by Isidoro Diaz. Service due by 3/11/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Against the US)(Iguina-Gonzalez, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidoro Diaz
Represented By: Antonio Iguina-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?