Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Almeida-Leon et al

Plaintiff: FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Mr. Francisco Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles, Mr. Juan Almeida-Leon, Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC, The Conjugal Partnership between Francisco Almeida-Leon and Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz
Case Number: 3:2018cv01960
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Schmitt, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz, Wanda Cruz-Quiles Responses due by 2/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #32 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/05/2019. (brc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 32 Motion In Compliance as to 28 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Roberto Berrios-Falcon on behalf of Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC Responses due by 2/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief of Federal Appellants)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Berrios-Falcon, Roberto)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #30 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The reply will strictly comply with Local Rule 7(c). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/01/2019. (brc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Responses due by 2/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mellado-Villarreal, Jairo)
February 1, 2019 Filing 29 Motion In Compliance as to 28 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Roberto Berrios-Falcon on behalf of Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC Responses due by 2/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellants' Brief, #2 Exhibit Appellee's Brief [U.S.], #3 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief [FDIC])(Related document(s) 28 ) (Berrios-Falcon, Roberto)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. No later than February 4, 2019, the defendants will file a copy of the briefs filed by the United States and them before the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit in Civil No. 18-1907. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/01/2019. (brc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants Re: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Berrios-Perez, Edilberto)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #25 Motion to Continue: GRANTED. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is re-set for 2/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/1/2019. (grf)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue hearing of February 11, 2019 filed by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz, Wanda Cruz-Quiles Responses due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz, Wanda Cruz-Quiles (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED, but answer to complaint deadline is extended only until February 14, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/29/2019. (brc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Roberto Berrios-Falcon on behalf of Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC Responses due by 2/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Berrios-Falcon, Roberto)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Schmitt on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Schmitt, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Miriam Baum on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Baum, Lynne)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Informative Motion: NOTED. See order at docket no. 18. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/23/2019. (brc)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation : No later than February 1, 2019, defendants will oppose the motion for preliminary injunction. A hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction will be held on February 11, 2019 at 9:00 am. Motion due by 2/1/2019. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 1/23/2019.(grf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Preliminary Injunction Motion and Requesting Briefing Schedule filed by Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Responses due by 1/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mellado-Villarreal, Jairo)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline February 14, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/15/2019. (brc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 14, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Fernando E. Longo-Quinones on behalf of Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz, Wanda Cruz-Quiles Responses due by 1/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Longo-Quinones, Fernando)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/11/2019. (brc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Submitting the FDIC-R's Proof of Service filed by Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Francisco Almeida, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Juan Almeida, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service Wanda Cruz, #5 Exhibit Tenerife LLC Documents, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service Tenerife)(Mellado-Villarreal, Jairo)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hector J. Orejuela-Davila on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Responses due by 1/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Hector Orejuela, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Orejuela-Davila, Hector)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The #8 Motion submitting is NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/20/2018. (nat)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #9 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez, this case has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Judge Besosa consented to direct reassignment as case is related to 12-cv-2025-FAB. Judge Perez-Gimenez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (gr)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The Clerk of Court shall take note. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 12/19/2018.(PMA)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Exhibits re: #1 Complaint, filed by FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR filed by Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal on behalf of FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Mellado-Villarreal, Jairo)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles, Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC, The Conjugal Partnership between Francisco Almeida-Leon and Wanda Cruz-Quiles (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector J. Orejuela-Davila on behalf of FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR (Orejuela-Davila, Hector)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tessie Leal-Garabis on behalf of FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR (Leal-Garabis, Tessie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles, Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC, The Conjugal Partnership between Francisco Almeida-Leon and Wanda Cruz-Quiles, filed by FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR. Service due by 3/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Mellado-Villarreal, Jairo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Almeida-Leon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Francisco Almeida-Leon
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Represented By: Fernando E. Longo-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Cruz-Quiles
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Represented By: Fernando E. Longo-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Juan Almeida-Leon
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Represented By: Fernando E. Longo-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Roberto Berrios-Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Conjugal Partnership between Francisco Almeida-Leon and Wanda Cruz-Quiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Almeida-Cruz
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Represented By: Fernando E. Longo-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FDIC as Receiver of RG Premier Bank of PR
Represented By: Hector J. Orejuela-Davila
Represented By: Tessie Leal-Garabis
Represented By: Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Hector J. Orejuela-Davila
Represented By: Tessie Leal-Garabis
Represented By: Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Schmitt
Represented By: Lynne Miriam Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?