Seda Martinez et al v. National University College et al
Plaintiff: Jose Seda Martinez, Conjugal partnership Seda-Ramirez and Yasmin Ramirez Rodriguez
Defendant: Jane Doe, Corporation DEF, Insurance Company ABC, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe and National University College
Case Number: 3:2018cv01975
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/11/2019. (MES)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of National University College Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, April 17, 2019 at 2:00 PM in DRDs Chambers before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. The Initial Scheduling Conference Memoranda is due by Monday, April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/5/2019. (MES)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Giselle Colon-De-Ferenczi on behalf of Defendant National University College.(Colon-De-Ferenczi, Giselle)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Answer deadline due by February 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/8/2019. (MES)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Giselle Colon-De-Ferenczi on behalf of National University College (Colon-De-Ferenczi, Giselle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon National University College served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National University College. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (rim)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDERRE CODE OF CIVILITY.Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified on 12/19/2018 change event, document is not a motion (gav).
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6191440.), filed by Conjugal partnership Seda-Ramirez, Yasmin Ramirez Rodriguez, Jose Seda Martinez. Service due by 3/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seda Martinez et al v. National University College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National University College
Represented By: Giselle Colon-De-Ferenczi
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Seda Martinez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal partnership Seda-Ramirez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Ramirez Rodriguez
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?