Los Flamboyanes, Inc. v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Los Flamboyanes, Inc.
Defendant: Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc., Triple-S Propiedad, Inc., A, B and C Corporations, John Does 1, 2 and 3 and Unknown Insurance Companies A through H
Case Number: 3:2018cv01997
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTriple-S Insurance Agency, Inc., Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Triple-S Management, Inc. for Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.; Corporate Parent Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. for Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc... (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline due February 25, 2019. No additional extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/25/2019. (brc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/25/19 to File Answer filed by Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman on behalf of Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc., Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019; Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Efron, David)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc., Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (rim)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6198009.), filed by Los Flamboyanes, Inc.. Service due by 3/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Flamboyanes, Inc. v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Flamboyanes, Inc.
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B and C Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies A through H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?