Garcia et al v. Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alice Garcia, Edwin Rodriguez-Lopez and Eric Rodriguez-Velez
Defendant: Dr. Luis Irizarry-Pabon, A, B, C Insurance Companies, John Doe, Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X, Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc., James Roe and E, F, G Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2018cv02022
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc., Dr. Luis Irizarry-Pabon (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Noting #2 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/2/2019.(LMR)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (vdm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (0104-6203460) against All Defendants, filed by Eric Rodriguez-Velez, Edwin Rodriguez-Lopez, Alice Garcia. Service due by 3/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Luis Irizarry-Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, C Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Episcopal San Lucas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E, F, G Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?