Pan American Grain Co. Inc. et al v. San Juan et al

Plaintiff: Pan American Grain Co. Inc., Pan American Properties, Corp. and Pan American Grain Mfg. Co., Inc.
Defendant: Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto and Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto
Case Number: 3:2019cv01018
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 27 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2019.(LMR)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting #25 "Motion for Dismissal Under Rule 41(a)(2)." Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice, without the imposition of costs or attorney's fees. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2019. (LMR)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) as to Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto, Municipality of San Juan filed by Edwin Prado-Galarza on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) as to All Parties filed by Javier A. Villar-Rosa on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Villar-Rosa, Javier)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Case called for first day of Show Cause Hearing on 1/11/2019. Present: Attorneys Edwin Prado, Javier Villar and Antonio Moreda for Pan American, et al. and Attorneys Raul Mariani and Carlos Hernandez for the Municipality of San Juan Puerto Rico, et al. During the day parties met under the court's supervision to discuss applicable law, discuss testimonies, exchange exhibits, propose stipulation of facts and elaborate on their theories of law. Proceeding began at 9:57 a.m., recessed at noontime and reconvened at 1:45 p.m. until 5:55 p.m. Further Show Cause Hearing set for 1/14/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) (cc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noting #17 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/11/2019.(EMJ)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Noting #19 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/11/2019.(EMJ) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date (ab).
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRITP REQUEST of Injunction Hearing to be held on January 11, 2019 and any continuance that might ensue by Javier Villar-Rosa. (Villar-Rosa, Javier) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct title (ab).
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos M. Hernandez-Lopez on behalf of All Defendants (Hernandez-Lopez, Carlos)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Noting #16 "Motion In Compliance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/10/2019. (LMR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier A. Villar-Rosa on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Villar-Rosa, Javier)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 Motion In Compliance as to #10 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Edwin Prado-Galarza on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pan American Grain Co. Inc., Pan American Properties, Corp., Pan American Grain Mfg. Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Denying #12 "Urgent Motion Requesting One Day Continuance." The court understands the reasons stated by attorney Mariani in support of his request for continuance. However, considering previously scheduled criminal matters (including trial) before the undersigned; attorney Mariani's limited availability for next week; and the fact that the Municipal Ordinance at issue is linked to a festivity scheduled to begin on 1/16/2019, the court cannot accommodate defendants' request. Furthermore, expedited resolution of the issues at hand is warranted. Therefore, the Show Cause hearing will remain as set. Defendants shall make arrangements to secure counsel and appear at the hearing on the date and time set at Docket No. 10. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/9/2019. (LMR)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #11 "Notice of Appearance" filed by Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto, Municipality of San Juan. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/9/2019.(LMR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing by one business day filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto, Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 1/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto, Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #1 "Verified Complaint for a Temporary Restraining Order, Injunctive Relief and Damages." The request for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. A hearing is hereby set for Friday, January 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3. At the hearing, defendants shall be prepared to show cause as to why a preliminary injunction shall not be issued as requested at Docket No. 1. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/10/2019. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/9/2019.(LMR)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #6 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Judge Dominguez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 01/09/2019. (ft)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Municipality of San Juan served on 1/9/2018, answer due 1/30/2018. (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto served on 1/9/2018, answer due 1/30/2018. (Prado-Galarza, Edwin)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby recuses himself from this matter, thus, returning the instant case to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/9/2019. (EA)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #4 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. Judge Perez-Gimenez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 01/09/2019. (ft)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby recuses himself from this matter and returns this case to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2018.(om)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto, Municipality of San Juan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6211237.), filed by Pan American Grain Co. Inc., Pan American Properties, Corp., Pan American Grain Mfg. Co., Inc.. Service due by 4/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Municipal Ordinance No. 4 Pt. I, #4 Exhibit 1 - Municipal Ordinance No. 4 Pt. II, #5 Exhibit 1 [Translated] Municipal Ordinance No. 4, 2018-2019 Series, #6 Exhibit A - Unsworn Declaration, #7 Summons Mayor Carmen Yuln, #8 Summons Municipality of San Juan)(Prado-Galarza, Edwin) Modified on 1/9/2019 add text (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pan American Grain Co. Inc. et al v. San Juan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of San Juan
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Represented By: Carlos M. Hernandez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Yulin Cruz Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Yulin Cruz-Soto
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Represented By: Carlos M. Hernandez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pan American Grain Co. Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Represented By: Javier A. Villar-Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pan American Properties, Corp.
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Represented By: Javier A. Villar-Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pan American Grain Mfg. Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Represented By: Javier A. Villar-Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?