Marcano-Martinez et al v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Hernandez Diaz, Hector Marcano Martinez, Hector Marcano-Martinez and Wanda Hernandez-Diaz
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies, A through H, Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, A, B and C Corporations and John Does 1, 2 and 3
Case Number: 3:2019cv01023
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue. The Initial Scheduling/Settlement Conference is reset for 4/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in SCC's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 3/8/2019. (mcv)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Settlement Conference filed by Victor J. Casal-Vazquez on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casal-Vazquez, Victor)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: A Joint ISC Memorandum is due by 4/1/2019 covering all items in Judge Gelpi's Order at Docket No. #9 . An Initial Scheduling/Settlement Conference is set for 4/11/2019 at 9:30 AM in SCC's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Joint Motions to continue the Initial Scheduling and Settlement Conference shall include three alternative dates in which all parties are available. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 3/5/2019.(mcv)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #9 Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct an Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference during the month of April 2019. Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2019. (gr)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference. Failure to comply in a timely manner with the deadlines and directives detailed in this referral order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/4/2019. (gmm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Victor J. Casal-Vazquez on behalf of Defendant Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico.(Casal-Vazquez, Victor)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting as requested #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/1/2019. (AGF)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 3, 2019 to File Answer filed by Victor J. Casal-Vazquez on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico Responses due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casal-Vazquez, Victor)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Efron, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6211766.), filed by Hector Marcano Martinez, Wanda Hernandez Diaz. Service due by 4/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcano-Martinez et al v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies, A through H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Victor J. Casal-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B and C Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Hernandez Diaz
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Marcano Martinez
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Marcano-Martinez
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Hernandez-Diaz
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?