MADERA COLON v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: OLGA M MADERA COLON and Olga M. Madera-Colon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01027
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/15/2019. by Olga M. Madera-Colon upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Colon-Flores, Rafael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. By Order of Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1027 (MEL). Judge Judge Francisco A. Besosa no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2019. (nat)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge: NOTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for all proceedings, including the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/11/2019. (brc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED 01/11/2019 by OLGA M MADERA COLON. (Colon-Flores, Rafael)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/11/2019. (brc)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint. No later than January 18, 2019, plaintiff will inform the Court whether she consents that a magistrate judge handle all proceedings, to include the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/11/2019. (brc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis DATED 01/10/2019 filed by Rafael Colon-Flores on behalf of OLGA M MADERA COLON Responses due by 1/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT DATED 01/10/2019 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by OLGA M MADERA COLON. Service due by 4/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 CURRENT ADDRESS NOTICE)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADERA COLON v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLGA M MADERA COLON
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga M. Madera-Colon
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?