Iturrino Carillo et al v. Marina PDR Operation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Iturrino Carillo, Isabel Garcia Galanes and Conjugal Partnership Iturrino-Garcia
Defendant: St James Security Services and Marina PDR Operation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01041
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #20 "Motion for Leave to File Reply." Reply due not later than March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/8/2019. (EMJ)
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 "St. James Security, Inc.'s Joinder to Marina Puerto Del Rey Operations, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Remand." The request for joinder is granted. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/7/2019.(EMJ)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder to Marina PDR Operations, LLC Opposition to Motion to Remand Re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Marina PDR Operation, LLC filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of St James Security Services Responses due by 3/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of St James Security Services (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Marina PDR Operation, LLC Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Isabel Garcia Galanes, Carlos Iturrino Carillo, Conjugal Partnership Iturrino-Garcia filed by Marina PDR Operation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Braulio Mercader v. Puerto Rico Freight, #2 Exhibit Tienda Escolar v. Magic Transport)(Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting #14 "Motion Requesting that Deadline to Answer Complaint Held in Abeyance Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/26/2019. (EMJ)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Deadline to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of St James Security Services Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: #12 "Motion for Remand." Defendant shall respond not later than March 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/19/2019.(EMJ)
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #10 "Request for Brief Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/14/2019.(EMJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of St James Security Services Responses due by 2/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 "Motion for Brief 7 Day Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/13/2019.(EMJ)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2019 to File Answer Motion for Brief 7-Day Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise Plead re: 6 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Pedro Quinones-Suarez on behalf of Marina PDR Operation, LLC Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #4 "Consent to Removal." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/18/2019. (EMJ) Modified on 1/18/2019 to add docket # 4 (mr).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting motions for extension of time at Dockets No. #2 and #3 . Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead not later than February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/18/2019.(EMJ)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Removal filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of St James Security Services Responses due by 1/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance and Reqiest for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of St James Security Services (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 15, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Marina PDR Operation, LLC filed by Pedro Quinones-Suarez on behalf of Marina PDR Operation, LLC Responses due by 1/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance Fajardo, case number FA2018CV00695. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6221808), filed by Marina PDR Operation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Transaltions of COmplaint and Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit Spanish Language Complaint and Summons, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iturrino Carillo et al v. Marina PDR Operation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St James Security Services
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Represented By: Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina PDR Operation, LLC
Represented By: Pedro Quinones-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Iturrino Carillo
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Garcia Galanes
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Iturrino-Garcia
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?