U.S. Bank National Association v. Marrero-Vera et al
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RCAC PASS-THROUGH TRUST, SERIES 2014 PR and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Aida Mercedes Rodriguez Marzan, United States of America, Harry Marrero Vera, Aida Mercedes Rodriguez-Marzan and Harry Marrero-Vera
Case Number: 3:2019cv01053
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 "Motion Requesting Order Staying the Proceedings Pursuant to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) Regulations." The case is stayed. Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on April 17, 2019, informing of the status of the loss mitigation proceedings, and every 30 days after that, until moving for the lifting of the stay. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/18/2019. (EMJ)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 3/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cartas. pagina periodico)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons by Publication as to Harry Marrero-Vera. (Attachments: #1 Summons by Publication) (ad)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion for Issuance of Summons by Publication." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/28/2019. (EMJ)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Harry Marrero-Vera filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Summons)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association upon Aida Mercedes Rodriguez-Marzan served on 2/3/2019, answer due 2/25/2019; United States of America served on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) Modified on 2/20/2019 to correct answer due date as to USA (mr).
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aida Mercedes Rodriguez Marzan, Harry Marrero Vera, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aida Mercedes Rodriguez Marzan, Harry Marrero Vera, United States of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6227499.), filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RCAC PASS-THROUGH TRUST, SERIES 2014 PR. Service due by 4/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Marrero-Vera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RCAC PASS-THROUGH TRUST, SERIES 2014 PR
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida Mercedes Rodriguez Marzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Marrero Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aida Mercedes Rodriguez-Marzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Marrero-Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?