Diaz v. Popular Securities, LLC
Petitioner: Manuel G. Diaz
Respondent: Popular Securities, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01065
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Petition to Vacate Award filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended Petition)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Manuel G. Diaz filed by Alejandro Febres-Jorge on behalf of Petitioner Manuel G. Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer to Statement of Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Ranking Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Arbitration Selection Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - IPHC Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Updated Disclosure Seier, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pre Hearing Brief, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cl Amended Pre-Hearing Brief, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Award)(Febres-Jorge, Alejandro)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPopular Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Popular Inc. for Popular Securities, LLC.. (Febres-Jorge, Alejandro)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Request of Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Vacate Award by Alejandro Febres-Jorge on behalf of Popular Securities, LLC (Febres-Jorge, Alejandro)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel G. Diaz upon Popular Securities, LLC, served on 1/29/19, answer due by 2/19/19 (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) Modified on 2/12/2019 to correct event. (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Popular Securities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Popular Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6229875.), filed by Manuel G. Diaz. Service due by 4/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appendix Verified Statement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Category Sheet, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Popular Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel G. Diaz
Represented By: Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Popular Securities, LLC
Represented By: Alejandro Febres-Jorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?