United States v. Maldonado-Rodriguez
Plaintiff: Marisol Maldonado Rodriguez and United States
Case Number: 3:2019cv01067
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: The Court hereby enters a final judgment pursuant to the terms and conditions set forth in the motion for consent judgement. THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/19/2019. (MES)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/19/2019. (MES)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION requesting Order for Consent Judgment filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of United States Responses due by 2/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marisol Maldonado Rodriguez, filed by United States. Service due by 4/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Maldonado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Maldonado Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?