USA v. $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01075
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued to arrest property as to $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (rim)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. "Motion allowed. The case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of any interested party at any time." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/7/2019. (EES)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Signed by Judge William G. Young on 2/7/2019. (EES)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of USA Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of USA Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by USA. Service due by 4/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $26,226.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Hector Ramirez-Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?