Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Defendant: Nathaly Rivera, Nabtanahel Rivera, Garaje Rivera PR, Inc and Nathaly A. Rivera-Zeno
Case Number: 3:2019cv01080
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION Tendering Certified Translation of Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana) Modified on 3/15/2019 to edit title (mcm).
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Restrict Document Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Extension of Time to File Certified Translation of Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana). Added event and modified docket text on 3/4/2019 (idg).
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By #13 Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo, this case has been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for hearing, and Report and Recommendation as to the request for Preliminary Injunction (see, Docket no. 11). Signed by Clerk on 02/06/2019. (gr)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denied #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The request for preliminary injunction included in docket entry #11 is REFERRED TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE-JUDGE, for hearing and R&R. Plaintiff shall serve defendants with copy of this Order and all pleadings in this case by 2/27/2019. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 2/6/2019. (mld)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER noted #4 Informative Motion; granted until 2/28/2019 #7 Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents and for Extension of Time to File Certified English Translations. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 2/6/2019. (mld)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luz V. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Luz). Added event on 1/31/2019 (idg).
January 28, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . ***FILED IN ERROR - Missing Case Number. To be corrected and re-filed.*** (idg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR - Missing Case Number. To be corrected and re-filed.*** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luz V. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Luz) Modified docket text on 1/30/2019 (idg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Garaje Rivera PR, Inc, Nabtanahel Rivera, Nathaly Rivera (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Extension of Time to File Certified Translations filed by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana). Added event on 1/30/2019 (idg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury and Category Sheet re #1 Complaint (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana) Modified to add relationship on 1/30/2019 (idg).
January 25, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Verified Complaint Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel to re-file using correct event.*** (mcm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Amend/Correct Verified Complaint Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana) Modified on 1/28/2019 (mcm).
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding TPPRCs Intention to File a Motion for TRO and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Luz V. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Rivera, Luz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Luz V. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quinones-Rivera, Luz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. Service due by 4/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Category Sheet, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaly Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabtanahel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garaje Rivera PR, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaly A. Rivera-Zeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Luz V. Quinones-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?