Perez-Rodriguez v. Municipio de Guaynabo

Plaintiff: Estefany Perez and Estefany Perez-Rodriguez
Defendant: Municipio de Guaynabo
Case Number: 3:2019cv01116
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Claudio Aliff-Ortiz on behalf of Defendant Municipio de Guaynabo.(Aliff-Ortiz, Claudio)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 03/22/2019. (lir)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until March 30, 2019 to Answer or otherwise Plead filed by Claudio Aliff-Ortiz on behalf of Municipio de Guaynabo Responses due by 3/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aliff-Ortiz, Claudio)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila J. Torres-Delgado on behalf of Municipio de Guaynabo (Torres-Delgado, Sheila)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz on behalf of Municipio de Guaynabo (Aldarondo-Ortiz, Eliezer)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estefany Perez-Rodriguez upon Municipio de Guaynabo served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Vazquez, III, Pedro)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Municipio de Guaynabo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (ad)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vilma M. Dapena-Rodriguez on behalf of Estefany Perez (Dapena-Rodriguez, Vilma)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipio de Guaynabo ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6251449.), filed by Estefany Perez. Service due by 5/6/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Vazquez, III, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Rodriguez v. Municipio de Guaynabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estefany Perez
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez, III
Represented By: Vilma M. Dapena-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estefany Perez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez, III
Represented By: Vilma M. Dapena-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipio de Guaynabo
Represented By: Sheila J. Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?