Segura-Limardo v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: MS MARIANELA SEGURA LIMARDO and Marianela Segura-Limardo
Defendant: United States Attorn United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, NOVAD SUTHERLAND MANAGEMENT CONSULTING LLC, Novad/Sutherland Management Consulting LLC and United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 3:2019cv01120
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marianela Segura-Limardo upon United States Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Ortiz-Segura, Luis)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Novad/Sutherland Management Consulting LLC , United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 2/7/2019 to replace uppercase letters (gmm).
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6254546) (arg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novad/Sutherland Management Consulting LLC , United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, filed by MARIANELA SEGURA LIMARDO. Service due by 5/7/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Dept of Housing, #4 Summons Novad Sutherland)(Ortiz-Segura, Luis) Modified on 2/7/2019 to replace uppercase letters (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura-Limardo v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorn United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVAD SUTHERLAND MANAGEMENT CONSULTING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novad/Sutherland Management Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS MARIANELA SEGURA LIMARDO
Represented By: Luis R. Ortiz-Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianela Segura-Limardo
Represented By: Luis R. Ortiz-Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?