Ramos-Irizarry v. Departamento de Correcion, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Israel Ramos-Irizarry
Defendant: Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos, FNU Gonzalez, FNU Afanador, FNU Andujar, FNU Melendez, FNU Hernandez and Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Case Number: 3:2019cv01125
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer due May 1, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/01/2019. (brc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2019 to File Answer filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Israel Ramos-Irizarry as to FNU Afanador, FNU Andujar, FNU Gonzalez, FNU Hernandez, FNU Melendez. (ab)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019; Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (ab)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Change of Address: NOTED. The Clerk will note petitioner Ramos-Irizarry's new address. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/27/2019. (brc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address filed Israel Ramos-Irizarry, Pro Se in the Spanish language. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ab)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FNU Afanador, FNU Andujar, Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion, FNU Gonzalez, FNU Hernandez, Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos, FNU Melendez. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Summons will be served by the United States Marshal. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/14/19.(ab)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/13/2019. (brc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos, FNU Afanador, FNU Andujar, FNU Gonzalez, FNU Hernandez, FNU Melendez, filed by Israel Ramos-Irizarry, Pro Se. Service due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Israel Ramos-Irizarry, Pro Se. (rim)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Israel Ramos-Irizarry, Pro Se. Responses due by 2/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos-Irizarry v. Departamento de Correcion, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institucion Correccional Sabana Hoyos
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Afanador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Andujar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Ramos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?