Gonzalez Cotto v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Luz N Gonzalez Cotto and Luz N. Gonzalez-Cotto
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01129
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to prove Service of Summons in Social Security Case by Luz N. Gonzalez-Cotto upon by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Luz N. Gonzalez-Cotto. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Mail Receipt)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro) Modified on 3/27/2019 to edit event and title (mcm).
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM upon U.S. Attorney's Office-District of Puerto Rico served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (mcm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security through the US Marshals with Copy of Order, Copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Granted. Summons shall be issued. The USMS shall serve summons. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 2/12/2019. (bgl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for all further proceedings and entry of a final judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1129 (MEL). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2019. (gr)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to a magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/11/2019. (brc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Luz N Gonzalez Cotto. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Luz N Gonzalez Cotto (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Luz N Gonzalez Cotto. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Luz N Gonzalez Cotto Responses due by 2/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Luz N Gonzalez Cotto. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Cotto v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz N Gonzalez Cotto
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz N. Gonzalez-Cotto
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?