Matosantos Vallecillo et al v. Matosantos Vallecillo et al

Plaintiff: Mr Manuel Matosantos Vallecillo, Mrs. Gloria Matosantos Vallecillo, Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo and Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, Mr. Rogelio Munoz, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Insurance Companies A, B & C, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Mrs. Franziska Hanreich-Prez, Mr Geronimo Matosantos Vallecillo, Gegloma Realty Corporation, Conjugal Partnership between Perez and Hanreich-Perez, Trusts I & II, Mrs. Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona, Conjugal Partnership between Rogelio Munoz and Alma Biblioni, Mr. Federico Cardona a/k/a Federico Felices, Mrs. Alma Biblioni, Mr. Victor Perez, CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Conjugal Partnership between Federico Cardona and Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Rogelio Munoz, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Jane Doe 1-10, Mrs. Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo, Alma Biblioni, Federico Felices, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, John Doe 1-10 and Franziska Hanreich-Perez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01131
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations re: #7 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-2, #2 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-3, #3 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-4, #4 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-7, #5 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-9, #6 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-11, #7 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-12, #8 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-16, #9 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-18, #10 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-21, #11 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-24, #12 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-25, #13 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-26, #14 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-28, #15 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-29, #16 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-30, #17 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-33, #18 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-35, #19 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-37, #20 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-38, #21 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-39, #22 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-40, #23 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-42, #24 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-43, #25 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 7-32)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
April 3, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2019 to File Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Gegloma Realty Corporation Responses due by 4/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation filed by Raul Gonzalez-Toro on behalf of Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translation to English language)(Gonzalez-Toro, Raul)
April 2, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION Submitting Exhibit C to Docket No. 55 re: #55 Response to Order to Show Cause,, filed by Rogelio Munoz, Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez, Trusts I & II Responses due by 4/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 1, #2 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 2, #3 Appendix Exhibit C - Part 3)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, MOTION for Joinder Re: #55 Response to Order to Show Cause,, filed by Rogelio Munoz, Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Tulla, Eric)
April 1, 2019 Filing 59 STATEMENT Plaintiff's RICO Case Statement filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo re: #30 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commonwealth Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Written Consent, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 29th letter) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
April 1, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/8/2019 to file certified English translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
April 1, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Document with pages in excess filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
April 1, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
April 1, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO DISMISS filed by Alma Biblioni, Victor Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Federico Cardona-Firpi, Rogelio Munoz Re: 49 Order,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, #30 Order filed by Alma Biblioni, Victor Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Federico Cardona-Firpi, Rogelio Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/2/2019 to edit event (rom).
March 28, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo(personally and as trustee of the Fideicomiso Matosantos-Lewis) Re: #53 MOTION to Expedite filed by CC1 Acquisition, LLC filed by Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo(personally and as trustee of the Fideicomiso Matosantos-Lewis). (Liong-Rodriguez, Steven)
March 28, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Expedite filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of CC1 Acquisition, LLC Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION Submitting Documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of CC1 Acquisition, LLC Responses due by 4/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
March 25, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for extension of time until 4/5/2019 to file Certified English Translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
March 22, 2019 Filing 50 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding RICO Case Statement filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. re #40 MOTION for Joinder to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #42 MOTION for Extension of Time until 20 days after Plaintiff file the RICO case statement to File Answer to Amended Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CC1's Partial Joinder to "Motion for Preliminary Injunction" and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #45 Emergency MOTION requesting Order Setting a Schedule to Respond to RICO Statement and Answer the Amended Verified Complaint and Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. The motions at ECF Nos. 40, 42, 44, and 45 are NOTED. As explained in the March 11, 2019 Order at ECF No. 30, all parties asserting a RICO claim have 20 days from the date of that order to file the requisite RICO case statement while all defendants have the same 20-day period to file an opposition to plaintiffs' assertions of jurisdiction contained in the amended complaint. No reason has been provided precluding the filing of simultaneous briefs. Upon resolution of the jurisdictional conflict, the Court will permit defendants additional time to answer the amended complaint if necessary. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/20/2019.(wm) Modified on 3/21/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
March 20, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Joinder Re: #47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rogelio Munoz, Alma Biblioni, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Victor Perez, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez Responses due by 4/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Tulla, Eric) Modified on 3/21/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
March 19, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Requesting Order Setting a Schedule to Respond to RICO Statement and Answer the Amended Verified Complaint and Response to "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead" Filed as Docket No. 42 filed by Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo(personally and as trustee of the Fideicomiso Matosantos-Lewis), Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez Re: #45 Emergency MOTION requesting Order Setting a Schedule to Respond to RICO Statement and Answer the Amended Verified Complaint and Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed as Docket No. 42 filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo(personally and as trustee of the Fideicomiso Matosantos-Lewis), Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez. (Liong-Rodriguez, Steven)
March 19, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joaquin Monserrate-Matienzo on behalf of CC1 Acquisition, LLC (Monserrate-Matienzo, Joaquin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 45 Emergency MOTION requesting Order Setting a Schedule to Respond to RICO Statement and Answer the Amended Verified Complaint and Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed as Docket No. 42 filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
March 18, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CC1's Partial Joinder to "Motion for Preliminary Injunction" and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of CC1 Acquisition, LLC Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Verified Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Defendant Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo.(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time until 20 days after Plaintiff file the RICO case statement to File Answer to Amended Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: 31 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez Responses due by 4/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Tulla, Eric)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #41 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim. ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file with a Certificate of Service included.*** (rom)
March 15, 2019 Filing 41 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Defendant Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo.(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) Modified on 3/18/2019 (rom).
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Joinder to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Re: #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Raul Gonzalez-Toro on behalf of Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 3/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Gonzalez-Toro, Raul)
March 13, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Luz C. Molinelli-Gonzalez on behalf of Gegloma Realty Corporation (Molinelli-Gonzalez, Luz)
March 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Gegloma Realty Corporation by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Gegloma Realty Corporation (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #26 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for extension of time. Noted. Certified translations are due 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #8 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for extension of time. Noted. Certified translations are due 3/25/22019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER noted #3 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER noted #6 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for extension of time. Noted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #22 Motion to Compel and for extension of time. This motion has been Granted pursuant to the court's order at ECF No. 30. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/12/2019. (wm)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a RICO Case Statement. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/11/2019.(wm)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #28 Order of Disqualification entered by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Judge Carmen C. Cerezo is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 03/08/2019. (ft)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Judge Carmen C. Cerezo recused. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 3/8/2019. (mld)
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Verification re #12 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo (Gonzalez-Toro, Raul)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #17 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate entry. Has been filed in d.e. #18 .*** (idg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for Extension of Time to File Certified English Translations filed by Raul Gonzalez-Toro on behalf of Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo. Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Toro, Raul). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/11/2019 (idg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Liong-Rodriguez on behalf of Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo (Liong-Rodriguez, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo. Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee) Modified docket text on 3/11/2019 (idg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgardo L. Rivera-Rivera and Lizabel M. Negron-Vargas on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo (Rivera-Rivera, Edgardo) Modified on 3/7/2019 to add attorney Negron-Vargas' name (gr).
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to File a RICO Case Statement and for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez. Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Coll, Jose). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/11/2019 (idg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira on behalf of Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona (Antonetti-Zequeira, Salvador)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Federico Hernandez-Denton on behalf of Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo (Hernandez-Denton, Federico)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, Victor Perez (Tulla, Eric)
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate entry. Has been filed in d.e. #18 .*** NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) Modified to file in error on 3/11/2019 (idg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Matosantos Commercial Corporation (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Alma Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Rogelio Munoz (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo upon Alma Biblioni served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; CC1 Acquisition, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; Federico Cardona-Firpi served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Franziska Hanreich-Perez served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Matosantos Commercial Corporation served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Rogelio Munoz served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Victor Perez served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Against Gernimo Matosantos Vallecillo Regarding Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction as to Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 3/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo filed by Raul Gonzalez-Toro on behalf of Defendants CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1)(Gonzalez-Toro, Raul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo Responses due by 3/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alma Biblioni, CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Jane Doe 1-10, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, Insurance Companies A, B & C, John Doe 1-10, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez, Trusts I & II (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for extension of time filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo. Responses due by 3/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal). Added event on 2/22/2019 (idg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Verified Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Summons Combined Summons)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alma Biblioni, CC1 Acquisition, LLC, Federico Cardona-Firpi, Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich, Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc., Gegloma Realty Corporation, Franziska Hanreich-Perez, Matosantos Commercial Corporation, Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo, Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona, Rogelio Munoz, Victor Perez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
February 10, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and, MOTION for extension of time until 3/11/2019 to file Certified English Translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6259708.), filed by Gloria Matosantos Vallecillo, Manuel Matosantos Vallecillo. Service due by 5/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Civil Cover Sheet, #46 Category Sheet, #47 Summons)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matosantos Vallecillo et al v. Matosantos Vallecillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Rogelio Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro-Caribe Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B & C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matosantos Commercial Corporation
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Franziska Hanreich-Prez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Geronimo Matosantos Vallecillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gegloma Realty Corporation
Represented By: Ivan Aponte-Figueroa
Represented By: Luz C. Molinelli-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership between Perez and Hanreich-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trusts I & II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership between Rogelio Munoz and Alma Biblioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Federico Cardona a/k/a Federico Felices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Alma Biblioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Victor Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC1 Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Joaquin Monserrate-Matienzo
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership between Federico Cardona and Cynthia Matosantos de Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico Cardona-Firpi
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Munoz
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Cardona-Matosantos
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Matosantos-de Cardona
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Biblioni
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico Felices
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: Salvador Antonetti-Zequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geronimo Matosantos-Vallecillo
Represented By: Steven Liong-Rodriguez
Represented By: Federico Hernandez-Denton
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Perez
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Biblioni
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Perez-Hanreich
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franziska Hanreich-Perez
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Manuel Matosantos Vallecillo
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Gloria Matosantos Vallecillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Matosantos-Vallecillo
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Edgardo L. Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Lizabel M. Negron-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Matosantos-Vallecillo
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Raul Gonzalez-Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?