Munoz-Martinez v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Sary Muoz-Martinez and Sary Munoz-Martinez
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv01133
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 9) this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1133(MEL). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 03/28/2019. (gr)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: Upon the parties' consent, the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/28/2019.(LMR)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sary Munoz-Martinez. (Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Sary Munoz-Martinez upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/1/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. by Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez on behalf of Sary Munoz-Martinez.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Plaintiff shall inform the court not later than March 4, 2019 if she consents as well. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/21/2019. (EMJ)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct defedant name against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sary Munoz-Martinez.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liza A Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6260101.), filed by Sary Muoz-Martinez. Service due by 5/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz-Martinez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sary Muoz-Martinez
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sary Munoz-Martinez
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?