CAPO et al

Plaintiff: MS LYNNETTE CAPO and Lynnette Capo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01137
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynnette Capo upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 7), this case has been referred within the Case Assignment System to U.S. Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1137(CVR). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 02/20/2019. (gr)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez Rive: Given the parties' consent this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez Rive for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 USC Sec 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/20/2019. (LE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by LYNNETTE CAPO. (Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Commissioner has provided generic consent for all Social Security appeals to this Court. Plaintiff shall on or before Friday February 21, 2019, inform whether she consents as well to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. This will greatly expedite resolution of the instant administrative appeal, given the undersigned's congested criminal docket and calendar. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/19/2019. (LE)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6272329) (arg)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Rivera-Esteves on behalf of LYNNETTE CAPO (Rivera-Esteves, Raymond)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by LYNNETTE CAPO. Service due by 5/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ATTACHMENT 1, #2 Category Sheet ATTACHMENT 2, #3 Summons ATTACHMENT 3, #4 Summons ATTACHMENT 4, #5 Summons ATTACHMENT 5)(Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS LYNNETTE CAPO
Represented By: Raymond Rivera-Esteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Capo
Represented By: Raymond Rivera-Esteves
Represented By: Juan A. Hernandez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?