Cruz v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ana E Cruz and Ana E. Cruz
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv01142
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Martorani-Dale, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Ana E. Cruz upon Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/1/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. by Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez on behalf of Ana E. Cruz.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 7), this case has been referred within the Case Assignment System to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1142(BJM). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 02/20/2019. (gr)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Given the parties' consent, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 USC Sec 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/19/2019.(LE)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ana E. Cruz. (Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT to correct defedant name against Liza A. Berryhill, filed by Ana E. Cruz.(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Commissioner has consented to have all Social Security appeals referred to a magistrate judge as to all proceedings, including entry of judgment. Plaintiff shall likewise inform on or before February 22, 2019. Plaintiff is advised that this will expedite resolution of this appeal, whereas the undersigned judge has a congested criminal docket. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/15/2019. (AGF)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liza A Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6268779.), filed by Ana E Cruz. Service due by 5/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Rivera-Sanchez, Ramon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana E Cruz
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana E. Cruz
Represented By: Ramon H. Rivera-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liza A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?