Geigel v. Electric Power Authority

Plaintiff: Carlos E. Geigel
Defendant: Electric Power Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv01154
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING without prejudice the Complaint. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/5/2019. (LE)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Judgment will be entered dismissing without prejudice the complaint, so that it properly be filed in Commonwealth Court. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/5/2019. (LE)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Carlos E. Geigel on behalf of Carlos E. Geigel Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Geigel, Carlos)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff shall show cause on or before March 15, 2019 as to why this case should not be dismissed for failing to state a federal claim. In essence, plaintiff claims that he is not afforded due process because his electric power bill is in error. Notwithstanding his characterization, there exists a clear state process for objecting any such errors, and the same is subject to state judicial review. Otherwise, every objected electric bill would find its way to federal court. Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2019.Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/27/2019.(MET)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Electric Power Authority (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against Electric Power Authority, filed by Carlos E. Geigel. Service due by 5/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Action Summons)(Geigel, Carlos)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. Wrong event*** First NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 FEDERAL QUESTION, #2 INJUNCTION, #3 INJUNCTION) (Geigel, Carlos) Modified on 2/26/2019- Counsel was informed by telephone (gmm).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. Wrong documents*** NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Geigel, Carlos) Modified on 2/25/2019 - Counsel was informed by telephone (ab).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR. Wrong Event. Duplicate filing as in docket #1 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos E. Geigel upon (Geigel, Carlos) Modified on 2/25/2019 (ab).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR- PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET #5 COMPLAINT***COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Electric Power Authority ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6274826.), filed by Carlos E. Geigel. Service due by 5/20/2019,(Geigel, Carlos) Modified on 2/26/2019 (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geigel v. Electric Power Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Geigel
Represented By: Carlos E. Geigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Power Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?