DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc v. Burgos-Lozada

Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Defendant: Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada and Jose Burgos-Lozada
Case Number: 3:2019cv01162
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons by Publication as to Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada. (Attachments: #1 Summons By Publication) (ad)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/15/2019. (AGF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc Responses due by 4/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Summons)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noted #5 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/5/2019. (AGF)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc Responses due by 4/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6276827.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Service due by 5/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit mortgage note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc v. Burgos-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Miguel Burgos-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Burgos-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?