Garayalde-Rijos v. Municipality of Carolina

Plaintiff: Waleska Garayalde-Rijos
Defendant: Municipality of Carolina
Case Number: 3:2019cv01164
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER noted #8 INFORMATIVE motion and granting Motion to Consolidate, subject to Judge Delgado-Colon's consent. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/2/2019. (MQ)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 4/2/2019. (MQ)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Request for Consolidation of this case with Case No. 16-3091 (ADC) filed in said case. filed by Juan M. Frontera-Suau on behalf of Waleska Garayalde-Rijos Responses due by 4/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Frontera-Suau, Juan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarisa Sola-Gomez on behalf of Municipality of Carolina (Sola-Gomez, Clarisa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until April 25, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Luis E. Pabon-Roca on behalf of Municipality of Carolina Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pabon-Roca, Luis)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waleska Garayalde-Rijos upon Municipality of Carolina served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Frontera-Suau, Juan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Carolina (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100061972) (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Municipality of Carolina COMPLAINT, filed by Waleska Garayarde-Rijos, re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 2/22/2019. (arg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipality of Carolina, filed by Waleska Garayalde-Rijos. Service due by 5/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Appearance of Counsel)(Frontera-Suau, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garayalde-Rijos v. Municipality of Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waleska Garayalde-Rijos
Represented By: Juan M. Frontera-Suau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Carolina
Represented By: Luis E. Pabon-Roca
Represented By: Clarisa Sola-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?