USA v. Assorted Jewelry, Estimated Value $578,183.00 In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: ASSORTED JEWELRY, ESTIMATED VALUE: $578,183.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01166
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Restrict Document Unsworn Declaration at Docket No. 1, Attachment No. 1 filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 3/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against Assorted Jewelry, Estimated Value: $578,183.00 In U.S. Currency, filed by USA. Service due by 5/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit docket text and to add restriction to Attachment #1 as per AUSA's request (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Assorted Jewelry, Estimated Value $578,183.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSORTED JEWELRY, ESTIMATED VALUE: $578,183.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?