Federal Trade Commission v. F9 Advertising LLC et al

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Fastlane Sales LLC, Media Redefined LLC, Primed Marketing LLC, Hyper marketing Solutions LLC, Connected Ad station LLC, Ace Initiative Group, LLC, Responsive Media LLC, F9 Advertising LLC and Gopalkrishna Pai
Case Number: 3:2019cv01174
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Stay this Action During the Pendency of an Ongoing Criminal Investigation filed by F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Re: #35 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Federal Trade Commission filed by F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai. (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis)
April 17, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time filed by Federal Trade Commission Re: #34 MOTION for extension of time filed by Gopalkrishna Pai, F9 Advertising LLC filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att. A)(Madden, Gregory)
April 17, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for extension of time filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 5/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/11/2019. (EA)
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Gregory J. Madden on behalf of Federal Trade Commission Responses due by 4/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Madden, Gregory)
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Federal Trade Commission Re: #24 MOTION to Stay filed by Gopalkrishna Pai, F9 Advertising LLC, #25 MOTION to Stay Memoranum in Support re: #24 MOTION to Stay filed by Gopalkrishna Pai, F9 Advertising LLC filed by Gopalkrishna Pai, F9 Advertising LLC filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Madden, Gregory)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for extension of time. Defendants are to answer the complaint or otherwise plead within ten (10) days upon the ruling of the motion to stay. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/29/2019. (EA)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Plaintiff is to file its Response to motions at Dkt. Nos. #24 and #25 by 4/12/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/29/2019. (EA)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/29/2019. (EA)
March 29, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for extension of time until 10 days after deciding the motion to say to file responsive pleadings filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis) Modified on 4/1/2019 to remove restriction. Standing Order No. 9 states that the Motion to Restrict... "shall be open to public inspection..."*** (gav).
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Stay Memoranum in Support re: #24 MOTION to Stay filed by Gopalkrishna Pai, F9 Advertising LLC filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 24 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Stay filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER noted #22 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/29/2019. (EA)
March 29, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Joinder Legal Representation filed by Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 4/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rodriguez, Luis)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Entry of Default against co-defendants, Ace Initiative Group, LLC, Connected Ad Station, LLC, Fastlane Sales, LLC, Hyper Marketing Solutions, LLC, Media Redefined, LLC, Primed Marketing, LLC and Responsive Media, LLC. The entry of default will only be lifted upon the defendants' appropriate showing of good cause as to the reasons for failing to timely answer the complaint or otherwise plead, and the filing thereof. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/25/2019. (EA)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Entry as to Ace Initiative Group, LLC, Connected Ad station LLC, Fastlane Sales LLC, Hyper marketing Solutions LLC, Media Redefined LLC, Primed Marketing LLC, Responsive Media LLC filed by Michelle Schaefer on behalf of Federal Trade Commission Responses due by 4/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Michelle)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Co-defendant, Golpalkrishna Pai, is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/14/2019. (EA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 3/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon F9 Advertising LLC served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Gopalkrishna Pai served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Responsive Media LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Primed Marketing LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Media Redefined LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear PHV. Atty. Michael Raff is hereby authorized to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of F9 Advertising, LLC and Gopalkrishna Pai. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/12/2019. (EA)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear PHV. Atty. Andrew Gordon is hereby authorized to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of F9 Advertising, LLC and Gopalkrishna Pai. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/12/2019. (EA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Hyper marketing Solutions LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Fastlane Sales LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Connected Ad station LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Trade Commission upon Ace Initiative Group, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Madden, Gregory)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Michael Raff to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100062392) filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 3/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Andrew Gordon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100062393) filed by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai Responses due by 3/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of F9 Advertising LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ace Initiative Group, LLC, Connected Ad station LLC, F9 Advertising LLC, Fastlane Sales LLC, Hyper marketing Solutions LLC, Media Redefined LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai, Primed Marketing LLC, Responsive Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FTC against Ace Initiative Group, LLC, Connected Ad station LLC, F9 Advertising LLC, Fastlane Sales LLC, Hyper marketing Solutions LLC, Media Redefined LLC, Gopalkrishna Pai, Primed Marketing LLC, Responsive Media LLC, filed by Federal Trade Commission. Service due by 5/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Madden, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. F9 Advertising LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastlane Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media Redefined LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primed Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyper marketing Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connected Ad station LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Initiative Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Responsive Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F9 Advertising LLC
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Raff
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gopalkrishna Pai
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Luis R. Rivera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Raff
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Gregory J. Madden
Represented By: Michelle Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?