Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Central General de Trabajadores
Petitioner: Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Respondent: Central General de Trabajadores
Case Number: 3:2019cv01175
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Central General de Trabajadores (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion submitting: GRANTED. The Clerk will issue the summons forthwith. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/10/2019. (brc)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Proposed Summons filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 4/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/21/2019. (brc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. Certified translation due March 18, 2019. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/26/2019. (brc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Document English Translation filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 3/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against Central General de Trabajadores ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6281699.), filed by Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 5/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Award, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD.*** FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT. Counsel to re-file*** (ab)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 3/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Award)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro) Modified on 2/22/2019 (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Central General de Trabajadores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Pedro A. Buso-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Central General de Trabajadores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?