Garcia et al v. The Sallie Mae Corporation et at
Plaintiff: BRENDA IVELISSE LANDRAU, HECTOR ISAAC GARCIA, Hector I. Garcia, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Landrau and Brenda I. Landrau
Defendant: SALLIE MAE CORPORATION, Jane Doe and The Sallie Mae Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01181
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/18/2019. (brc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/18/2019. (brc)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : On February 26, 2019 the Clerk notified you that the filing of the Complaint was defective because the civil sheet and the category sheet were not included. No later than March 15, 2019 the category sheet and the civil cover sheet will be filed or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Category sheet and civil cover sheet due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/7/2019.(grf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 2/27/2019. (arg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6282788.), filed by HECTOR ISAAC GARCIA, BRENDA IVELISSE LANDRAU. Service due by 5/28/2019,(Cardona-Estelritz, Armando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. The Sallie Mae Corporation et at
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLIE MAE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sallie Mae Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA IVELISSE LANDRAU
Represented By: Armando Cardona-Estelritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR ISAAC GARCIA
Represented By: Armando Cardona-Estelritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector I. Garcia
Represented By: Armando Cardona-Estelritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Landrau
Represented By: Armando Cardona-Estelritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda I. Landrau
Represented By: Armando Cardona-Estelritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?