Perez-Mercado v. USA

Petitioner: Josue Perez-Mercado
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01185
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Referring Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Memorandum in support, filed by Josue Perez-Mercado. Respondent United States of America has 30 days from the date of issuance of this Order to file its response. Extensions shall not be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/1/2019.(wm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion under 28 USC 2255 filed by Josue Perez-Mercado Re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 08-310) filed by Josue Perez-Mercado filed by Josue Perez-Mercado. (Koury, Allison)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Brief. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect caption, wrong case number.*** (rom)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 5), this case is reassigned to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon, who was randomly drawn to preside over 08-cr-310-10 (see, 08-cr-310-10-ADC at Docket No. 5133). Signed by Clerk on 03/06/2019. (gr)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. I recuse myself from further presiding over this case. 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk will assign this case to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. See Criminal No. 08-310, Docket No. 5133. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/06/2019. (brc) Modified on 3/6/2019 to correct reference to reassigned judge and docket entry number related thereto (gr).
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison J. Koury on behalf of Josue Perez-Mercado (Koury, Allison)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of Defendant's Pro Se 2255 by Josue Perez-Mercado. (Koury, Allison) Modified on 3/7/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect caption.*** BRIEF in Support of Defendant's pro se 2255 by Josue Perez-Mercado. (Koury, Allison) Modified on 3/7/2019 (rom).
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 08-310) filed by Josue Perez-Mercado, Pro Se. Responses due by 3/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Mercado v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josue Perez-Mercado
Represented By: Allison J. Koury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?