United States of America v. Tua-Cruz et al

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Reynaldo Tua, Alida Bonilla, Alida Rodriguez-Bonilla and Reynaldo Tua-Cruz
Case Number: 3:2019cv01190
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Aida Rodriguez Bonilla by United States of America upon (Carroll, Jonathan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Reynaldo Tua-Cruz by United States of America upon (Carroll, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #8 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incomplete PDF/Wrong Event. Counsel to re-file complete PDF using Summons Returned Executed event. (rom)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incomplete PDF*** AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States of America upon Alida Rodriguez-Bonilla served on 3/24/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Carroll, Jonathan) Modified on 4/2/2019 (rom).
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incomplete PDF*** AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States of America upon Reynaldo Tua-Cruz served on 3/24/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Carroll, Jonathan) Modified on 4/2/2019 (rom).
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alida Rodriguez-Bonilla, Reynaldo Tua-Cruz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Summons Issued. ***FILED IN ERROR. Wrong pdf. Document will be re-filed.*** (ab)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG PDF***Summons Issued as to Alida Rodriguez-Bonilla, Reynaldo Tua-Cruz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 3/4/2019 (ab).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE filing of Category Sheet by United States re #1 Complaint (Carroll, Jonathan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 3/1/2019. (arg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. Service due by 5/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Reynaldo Cruz, #3 Summons to Alida Rodriguez)(Carroll, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tua-Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Jonathan D. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan D. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo Tua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alida Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alida Rodriguez-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo Tua-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?