Berrios-Flecha v. Triple-S Vida, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yetsenia Berrios-Flecha
Defendant: Triple-S Vida, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01198
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. See Order for further details. A Scheduling Conference is set for June 17, 2019 at 3:00 PM. IT IS SO ORDERED.Set Hearings Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 03:00 PM in DRD's Chambers at OLD SAN JUAN before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez.Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/15/2019.(JAM)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear and 30 days thereafter to start discovery. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/15/2019. (JAM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Fredeswin Perez-Caballero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Triple-S Vida, Inc. re #3 Notice of Appearance (Roman-Negron, Luis)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint at Docket # 1-7, filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Vida, Inc..(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. (Roman-Negron, Luis)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance - San Juan, case number SJ2019CV00326. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6293075), filed by Triple-S Vida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons (Spanish), #2 Exhibit A-1 - Death Certificate (Spanish), #3 Exhibit A-2 - Toxicology Exam (Spanish), #4 Exhibit A-3 - Letter Oct. 2018 (Spanish), #5 Exhibit A-4 - Reconsideration (Spanish), #6 Exhibit A-5 - Letter November 2018 (Spanish), #7 Exhibit B - Complaint and Summons (Cert. Trans.), #8 Exhibit B-1 - Death Certificate (Cert. Trans), #9 Exhibit B-2 - Toxicology Exam (Cert. Trans.), #10 Exhibit B-3 - Letter Oct. 2018 (Cert. Trans.), #11 Exhibit B-4 - Reconsideration (Cert. Trans.), #12 Exhibit B-5 - Letter November 2018 (Cert Trans.), #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Category Sheet)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrios-Flecha v. Triple-S Vida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Vida, Inc.
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Represented By: Luis R. Roman-Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yetsenia Berrios-Flecha
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?