Rosado-Molina v. Family Department of Puerto Rico et al

Plaintiff: Gloria Rosado-Molina
Defendant: Family Department of Puerto Rico, Justice Department of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Departamento de la Familia
Case Number: 3:2019cv01199
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear ; Granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/8/2019. (MET)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for extension of time until 5/3/2019 to answer the complaint or otherwise plead, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Family Department of Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6293262.), filed by Gloria Rosado-Molina. Service due by 5/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Family Dept., #4 Summons Justice Dept.)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Molina v. Family Department of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Rosado-Molina
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Department of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Department of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de la Familia
Represented By: Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?