Grafals-Semidei v. JetBlue Airways Corporation

Plaintiff: Eric Grafals-Semidei
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01208
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Grafals-Semidei upon JetBlue Airways Corporation served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noted #2 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/11/2019. (LE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Juan C. Garay-Massey on behalf of Eric Grafals-Semidei. (Garay-Massey, Juan) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct title (gmm).
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (vdm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover and Category Sheets re: #1 Complaint filed by Eric Grafals-Semidei filed by Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli on behalf of Eric Grafals-Semidei Responses due by 3/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6300520.), filed by Eric Grafals-Semidei. Service due by 6/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Del-Valle-Emmanuelli, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grafals-Semidei v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Grafals-Semidei
Represented By: Luis F. Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Juan C. Garay-Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?