Scotiabank de Puerto Rico v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company

Plaintiff: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01436
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #9 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/11/2019. (ebb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting and Granting #6 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time..." Appearing defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 7/5/2019.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/5/2019.(LMR)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #5 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/5/2019. (LMR)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance and Motion For Extension of Time to Answer And/Or Otherwise Plead by Fabian Rodriguez-Torres on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Rodriguez-Torres, Fabian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding effective service of Defendant filed by Daniel Enrique Matos-Melendez on behalf of Scotiabank de Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Matos-Melendez, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Enrique Colon-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Colon-Santana, Jose)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6390830.), filed by Scotiabank de Puerto Rico. Service due by 8/1/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit)(Matos-Melendez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotiabank de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Daniel Enrique Matos-Melendez
Represented By: Jose Enrique Colon-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Fabian Rodriguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?