Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) v. Comvaltech Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Defendant: Comvaltech Corp., Hector R. Figueroa-Fernandez and Edwin A. Algarin-Moure
3Rd Party Defendant: Wyeth Whitehall Pharmaceuticals, Pfizer Pharmaceutic, Inc. and Pfizer Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Intervenor: LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01440
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp. Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp., Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(gmm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Sanctions as to Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp. filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 7/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION Submitting Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #25 Response to Motion filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp. filed by LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 7/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 A - Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 JUDGMENT - REMANDING this case to the Court of First Instance, Carolina Part. Motion terminated: #20 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/24/2019. (mld)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION requesting Order to transfer case, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Pro Se. Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply, MOTION for Extension of Time until June 28, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #25 Response to Motion filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp. filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(idg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. (idg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(idg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 6/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. (Torrens-Davila, Jaime)
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Submitting Proof of Service of Process filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(idg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. (idg)
May 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: FDIC's Status as a Non-Party by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Sandell, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. (idg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION requesting Order to Notify the Parties filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(idg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION requesting Order to Notify Amended Parties filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(idg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct RG Premier Bank Documents filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(idg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 6/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(idg)
May 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION requesting Order to Cease Court Notifications filed by Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 6/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Attachments filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. (idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding attachments filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(idg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Cease Court Notifications in this Case filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc. Responses due by 5/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to transfer case, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg). Added event on 5/14/2019 (idg).
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION requesting Order for Permission from This Honorable Court to Accept all Pleadings Submitted in this Case in the Spanish Language filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp, pro se. Responses due by 5/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (idg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400 ) filed by Edwin A. Algarin-Moure, Comvaltech Corp., pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet)(idg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (idg). Modified to remove restrictions as per filer's request on 5/15/2019 (idg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) v. Comvaltech Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comvaltech Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector R. Figueroa-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin A. Algarin-Moure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Wyeth Whitehall Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceutic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: LiquidCapital Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Represented By: Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC)
Represented By: Liza Maria Delgado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jairo A. Mellado-Villarreal
Represented By: Wilnerys Alvarez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?