Rios et al v. Lantz et al

Plaintiff: Jahbyeck Gomez, Samuel Rios and Conjugal Parnership Rios-Gomez
Defendant: Steven Lantz, Rincon Encantado LLC and Francia Lantz
Case Number: 3:2019cv01454
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. An Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference is set for 7/18/2019 at 09:15 AM in MEL's Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Plaintiffs are strongly urged to retain the services of a lawyer to represent them in this case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 6/3/2019. (jjr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference. Failure to comply in a timely manner with the deadlines and directives detailed in this referral order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/3/2019. (gmm)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Noted #14 Motion Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/3/2019. (LE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Steven Lantz, Francia Lantz filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz Responses due by 6/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Defendants Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz.(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/21/2019. (LE)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #5 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/20/2019. (MET)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noted #3 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/20/2019. (MET)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations due in 30 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/20/2019. (MET)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 30, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time until May 30, 2019 to file Certified Translationsof Summons filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz Responses due by 5/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector J. Quinones-Inserni on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz (Quinones-Inserni, Hector)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 5/15/2019. (arg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Compliance with Filing Notice of Removal Before State Court filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Francia Lantz, Steven Lantz Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance in Aguada, case number AU2019cv00169. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6402305), filed by Steven Lantz, Francia Lantz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios et al v. Lantz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahbyeck Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Parnership Rios-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lantz
Represented By: Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez
Represented By: Hector J. Quinones-Inserni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rincon Encantado LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francia Lantz
Represented By: Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez
Represented By: Hector J. Quinones-Inserni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?