Charron-Walker v. Suarez-Castro et al

Plaintiff: Abey Charron-Walker
Defendant: Carlos Pesquera-Morales, Irasema Pesquera, Teresa Suarez-Castro, Fiftyone, LLC, Conjugal Partnership Pesquera-Pesquera, XYZ Insurance Companies, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Suarez, John Doe and Pesquera Comisionado 2016, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01473
Filed: May 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abey Charron-Walker re #7 Notice of Appearance (Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/12/2019. (AGF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael G. Martinez-Geigel on behalf of Abey Charron-Walker (Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Attorney Information Pursuant to FRCP 60(a) filed by Rafael G. Martinez-Geigel on behalf of Abey Charron-Walker Responses due by 6/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by Abey Charron-Walker.(Gonzalez-Elizalde, Juan J.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fiftyone, LLC, Irasema Pesquera, Pesquera Comisionado 2016, Inc., Carlos Pesquera-Morales, Teresa Suarez-Castro (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6411643.), filed by ABEY CHARRON-WALKER. Service due by 8/16/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Gonzalez-Elizalde, Juan J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charron-Walker v. Suarez-Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Pesquera-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irasema Pesquera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Suarez-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiftyone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Pesquera-Pesquera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pesquera Comisionado 2016, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abey Charron-Walker
Represented By: Juan J. Gonzalez-Elizalde
Represented By: Rafael G. Martinez-Geigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?