Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico Inc. et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Quinones-Figueroa, Nydia Hernandez-Gotay, Luis Barreto-Barreto, Club Gallistico de PR Inc., Mr. Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez, Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto, Nydia Mercedes Hernandez-Gotay and Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Defendant: Sonny Purdue, Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Justice, William P. Barr and United States of America
Amicus Curiae: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Juan Carlos Albors and Resident Commissioner of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2019cv01481
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Summons returned executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix) Modified on 7/9/2019 to edit title (gmm).
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wandymar Burgos-Vargas on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (Burgos-Vargas, Wandymar)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Denying #9 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/4/2019. (LE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by Juan Carlos Albors, Pro Se. Responses due by 6/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ft)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement byClub Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo on behalf of Resident Commissioner of Puerto Rico (Ferraiuoli-Hornedo, Veronica)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/23/2019.(MET)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noted #2 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/23/2019. (MET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Department of Agriculture, Sonny Purdue, United States Department of Justice, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Exhibits of Complaint filed by Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 DKT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 DKT 1, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 DKT 1, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 DKT 1)(Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix) Modified on 5/23/2019 to replace uppercase text (gmm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6417242.), filed by CLUB GALLISTICO DE PR INC. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Category Sheet)(Roman-Carrasquillo, Felix)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico Inc. et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Quinones-Figueroa
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nydia Hernandez-Gotay
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Barreto-Barreto
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Gallistico de PR Inc.
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Faustino Rosario-Rodriguez
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Joel Barreto-Barreto
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nydia Mercedes Hernandez-Gotay
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Gallistico de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Felix M. Roman-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Rafael A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Juan Carlos Albors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Resident Commissioner of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Veronica Ferraiuoli-Hornedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?