Philips Medical Systems Puerto Rico, Inc., et al v. Alpha Biomedical and Diagnostic Corp.
Plaintiff: PHILIPS MEDICAL SYSTEMS PUERTO RICO, INC.,, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. and PHILIPS INDIA LIMITED
Defendant: ALPHA BIOMEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC CORP. and Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01488
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss under Rules 12(b) and 19 as to Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp. filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp. Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Term Extension Request Under Local Civil Rule 6 by Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho on behalf of Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp. (Santiago-Camacho, Ineabelle) Modified to add event on 6/14/2019 (idg).
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALPHA BIOMEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC CORP. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (ad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALPHA BIOMEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC CORP. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6418497.), filed by PHILIPS MEDICAL SYSTEMS PUERTO RICO, INC.,, PHILIPS INDIA LIMITED, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summons Alpha, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Category Sheet EPO, #11 Category Sheet LAP, #12 Category Sheet ACC)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips Medical Systems Puerto Rico, Inc., et al v. Alpha Biomedical and Diagnostic Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPHA BIOMEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Biomedical and Diagostic Corp.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIPS MEDICAL SYSTEMS PUERTO RICO, INC.,
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIPS INDIA LIMITED
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?