Rivera-Sierra v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples, et al

Plaintiff: Miss Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra and Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra
Defendant: Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples, Jose Olivieri, Glenda Valenzuela and Conjugal Partnership Olivieri-Valenzuela
Case Number: 3:2019cv01489
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Order at Docket 9 and Informing Vacatios filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples Responses due by 7/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re ECF No. #5 , Noted. Defendant CSM's answer is due within 20 days of the date of this order. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/9/2019. (rom)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has not submitted a request for issuance of summonses for co-defendants Glenda Valenzuela, Jose Olivieri and the Conjugal Partnership Olivieri-Valenzuela. Plaintiff is expected to properly serve summonses upon all defendants before the 90 days time period for service expires on 8/20/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/10/2019. (gmm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Motion for Entry of Default, Denied in light of the filing at ECF No. #5 . Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/8/2019. (rom)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Defendant Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples.(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Entry of Default and Request for Extension of Time Until July 8, 2019, to File Responsive Pleading filed by Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples Re: #3 MOTION for Default Entry as to Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples filed by Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra filed by Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit event (rom).
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Default Entry as to Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples filed by Nelson Rivera-Cabrera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rivera-Cabrera, Nelson)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6418586.), filed by Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Rivera-Cabrera, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Sierra v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miss Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra
Represented By: Nelson Rivera-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiether Marie Rivera-Sierra
Represented By: Nelson Rivera-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Olivieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Olivieri-Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?