Martinez-Carrion v. Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Elsa Iris Martnez-Carrin and Elsa Iris Martinez-Carrion
Defendant: Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc. and Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01504
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/12/2019. (Arias-Marxuach, Raul)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Maria Eugenia Santori-Aymat on behalf of Defendant Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc.(Santori-Aymat, Maria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Maria Eugenia Santori-Aymat on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santori-Aymat, Maria)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez on behalf of Defendant Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc..(Ortiz-Rodriguez, Claribel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear and requesting extension of time; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 06/25/2019. (dv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 to File Answer filed by Jose F. Escobar-Machin on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc Responses due by 7/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Escobar-Machin, Jose)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Requesting Extension of Time to Plead filed by Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez on behalf of Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc. Responses due by 7/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortiz-Rodriguez, Claribel) Modified on 6/26/2019 to replace capital letters (ab).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/06/2019. (nat)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc, Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/28/2019. (ab)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fredeswin Perez-Caballero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support)(Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elsa Iris Martnez-Carrin. Service due by 8/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Menonita, #4 Summons Summons Plan de Slaud)(Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Carrion v. Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan de Salud Menonita, Inc.
Represented By: Claribel Ortiz-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc
Represented By: Maria Eugenia Santori-Aymat
Represented By: Jose F. Escobar-Machin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Iris Martnez-Carrin
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Iris Martinez-Carrion
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?