Ramirez v. Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez
Defendant: ABC Corporations, KOI IXS, LLC, John Doe, ABC Advertising Agency, Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc., XYZ Insurance Companies, Jane Doe, AIG Insurance - Puerto Rico and SHG PUERTO RICO, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01505
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Advertising Agency, ABC Corporations, AIG Insurance - Puerto Rico, Jane Doe, John Doe, KOI ARISE, LLC, KOI Americas, LLC, KOI IXS, LLC, XYZ Insurance Companies, SHG PUERTO RICO, INC., filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez.(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice." Plaintiff's claims against Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/27/2019.(LMR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Jorge Antonio Ramirez (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AIG Insurance - Puerto Rico, KOI ARISE, LLC, KOI Americas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Summons AIG, #2 Summons KOI Americas, #3 Summons Koi Arise)(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez.(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc., KOI IXS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6423175.), filed by Jorge A Ramirez. Service due by 8/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Hyatt, #4 Summons Koi, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOI IXS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Advertising Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Insurance - Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHG PUERTO RICO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?