Ramirez v. Dorado Beach Resort et al

Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez and Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Defendant: ABC Corporations, ABC Advertising Company, John Doe, Dorado Beach Resort and XYZ Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv01507
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or otherwise plead: GRANTED. Answer deadline August 19, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/18/2019. (brc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer The Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez on behalf of Dorado Beach Resort Responses due by 8/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Penagaricano-Suarez, Dora)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez on behalf of Dorado Beach Resort (Penagaricano-Suarez, Dora)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of Dorado Beach Resort (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred back to the docket of U.S. District Judge Francisco A. Besosa with the consent of Judge Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/10/2019. (gr)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/06/2019. (nat)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by Jorge Antonio Ramirez.(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dorado Beach Resort (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6423295.), filed by Jorge A Ramirez. Service due by 8/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Dorado Beach Resort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Advertising Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Beach Resort
Represented By: Dora M. Penagaricano-Suarez
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Antonio Ramirez
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?