US Premium Finance v. Five Development Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: US PREMIUM FINANCE A DIVISION OF AMERIS BANK and US Premium Finance
Defendant: FIVE DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, INC and AFFILIATES and Five Development Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01513
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, For Failure to Join Indispensable Parties and for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Five Development Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 8/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified translation Liquidation Order)(Bague-Soto, Jose)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/25/2019. (AGF)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Under Local Rule 7(d) filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Five Development Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 8/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bague-Soto, Jose)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting until July 25, 2019 #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/26/2019. (AGF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, filed by US Premium Finance filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Five Development Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 7/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bague-Soto, Jose)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Premium Finance upon Five Development Holdings, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #7 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/11/2019. (AGF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of US Premium Finance Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Rehabilitation Order, #2 Exhibit 8 - Liquidation Order)(Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations shall be filed in 20 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/3/2019. (AGF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of US Premium Finance Responses due by 6/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FIVE DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, INC and AFFILIATES (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byUS PREMIUM FINANCE A DIVISION OF AMERIS BANK identifying Corporate Parent Ameris Bancorp for US PREMIUM FINANCE A DIVISION OF AMERIS BANK.. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Collection of Monies against FIVE DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, INC and AFFILIATES ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6424851.), filed by US PREMIUM FINANCE A DIVISION OF AMERIS BANK. Service due by 8/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Category Sheet, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Premium Finance v. Five Development Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, INC and AFFILIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Development Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jose A. Bague-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US PREMIUM FINANCE A DIVISION OF AMERIS BANK
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Premium Finance
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?