Aspen American Insurance Company v. Blanco-Darcy et al
Plaintiff: Aspen American Insurance Company
Defendant: FirstBank, Caribe Power Corp. and Julio Blanco-Darcy
Case Number: 3:2019cv01516
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Daiana M. Freiria-Ramirez on behalf of Defendant FirstBank.(Freiria-Ramirez, Daiana)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer "Allowed. There shall be no further continuances." Answer deadline due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/11/2019. (EES)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for extension of time Answer deadline due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/11/2019. (EES)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/07/2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Aspen American Insurance Company filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of Julio Blanco-Darcy, Caribe Power Corp. Responses due by 7/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time by Daiana M. Freiria-Ramirez on behalf of FirstBank (Freiria-Ramirez, Daiana) Modified on 7/2/2019 event (gav).
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aspen American Insurance Company upon Caribe Power Corp. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aspen American Insurance Company upon Julio Blanco-Darcy served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aspen American Insurance Company upon FirstBank served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Julio Blanco-Darcy, Caribe Power Corp., FirstBank (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing, #3 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet and in Compliance With Court Order re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Aspen American Insurance Company filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company Responses due by 6/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 , #3 ) (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet and in Compliance With Court Order re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Aspen American Insurance Company Responses due by 6/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 5/30/2019. (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julio Blanco-Darcy, Caribe Power Corp., FirstBank ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6425924.), filed by Aspen American Insurance Company. Service due by 8/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inusrance Application 1, #2 Exhibit Insurance Application 2, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy 1, #4 Exhibit Insurance Policy 2, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Summons Blanco-D'Arcy's Summons, #7 Summons Caribe Power Corp.'s Summons, #8 Summons FirstBank's Summons)(Criado-Mangual, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen American Insurance Company v. Blanco-Darcy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstBank
Represented By: Daiana M. Freiria-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Power Corp.
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Blanco-Darcy
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?