Rodriguez v. Bard Shannon LTD et al
Plaintiff: Domingo Rodriguez
Defendant: Bard Shannon LTD and Personnel Recruiting Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01517
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Marta D. Masferrer on behalf of Personnel Recruiting Service. Responses due by 7/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Masferrer, Marta) Modified title on 7/1/2019 (idg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1st, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Domingo Rodriguez filed by Rhonda M. Castillo on behalf of Personnel Recruiting Service Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Castillo, Rhonda)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement byBard Shannon LTD identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Shannon LTD.. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 29, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Domingo Rodriguez filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Bard Shannon LTD Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Shannon LTD, Personnel Recruiting Service (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6426033.), filed by Domingo Rodriguez. Service due by 8/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summon Bard, #4 Summons Summon PRS)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Bard Shannon LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Shannon LTD
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personnel Recruiting Service
Represented By: Marta D. Masferrer
Represented By: Rhonda M. Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Rodriguez
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?