Vazquez-Ramos et al v. Triple S Salud, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Javier E Colon-Irizarry, West Urology Group PSC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Irma L Rivera-Ramos, Dr. Roberto Vazquez-Ramos, Luis M Muniz-Colon, Vazquez-Rivera Conjugal Partnership, Juan M Colon-Rivera, Advance Urology Group, LLC, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Juan M. Colon-Rivera and Javier E. Colon-Irizarry
Defendant: MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC, ABC Insurance Company, Hector M Rodriguez-Blazquez, Urologics, LLC, Triple S Salud, Inc., John Doe and Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01527
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting #18 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than August 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (EMJ)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting #17 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (EMJ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2019 to File Answer filed by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple S Salud, Inc. Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Negron, Luis)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noting and Granting #15 "Notice of Appearance and First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Hector Rodriguez Blazquez and Urologics, LLC shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 7/31/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/26/2019. (ebb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint of Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Vazquez-Rivera Conjugal Partnership, Juan M. Colon-Rivera, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, West Urology Group PSC, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Advance Urology Group, LLC, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos filed by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez, Urologics, LLC Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #11 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint." MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/24/2019. (ebb)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noted #12 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/24/2019. (ebb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 25, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 7/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dapena, Ramon)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than July 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/21/2019. (EMJ)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple S Salud, Inc. Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Negron, Luis)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Urologics, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rodriguez-Escudero, Emil)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Triple S Salud, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC, Hector M Rodriguez-Blazquez, Triple S Salud, Inc., Urologics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6430794.), filed by Luis M Muniz-Colon, Vazquez-Rivera Conjugal Partnership, West Urology Group PSC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Irma L Rivera-Ramos, Juan M Colon-Rivera, Javier E Colon-Irizarry, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos, Advance Urology Group, LLC. Service due by 8/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Triple S Salud, #4 Summons Hector Rodriguez-Blazquez, #5 Summons Urologics LLC, #6 Summons MSO of Puerto Rico LLC)(Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez-Ramos et al v. Triple S Salud, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier E Colon-Irizarry
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Urology Group PSC
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribbean Urocentre, CSP
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma L Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Roberto Vazquez-Ramos
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis M Muniz-Colon
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vazquez-Rivera Conjugal Partnership
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M Colon-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Urology Group, LLC
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma L. Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis M. Muniz-Colon
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M. Colon-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier E. Colon-Irizarry
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector M Rodriguez-Blazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urologics, LLC
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple S Salud, Inc.
Represented By: Luis R. Roman-Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?