Rosado-Arroyo et al v. Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Ramos Perez-Alvarez, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Juan C. Perez-Vargas and Wilfredo Rivera-Colon
Defendant: Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01547
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Re: #11 MOTION Reply To Motion Opposing Motion for Remand and as To GOYAS Subsequent Motions filed by Juan C. Perez-Vargas, Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Ramos Perez-Alvarez, Wilfredo Rivera-Colon, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) Modified on 7/18/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Dennis J. Cruz-Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appearance) (Cruz-Perez, Dennis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Reply to Response to MOTION, re #8 Motion to Remand as To GOYAS Subsequent Motions filed by Dennis J. Cruz-Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Perez, Dennis) Modified on 7/18/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg). Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit docket text. (mg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Deem Waived Objections to Motion to Dismiss re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #8 MOTION to Remand FOR Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction & Assuming Legal Representation/i& filed by Juan C. Perez-Vargas, Edwin S. Ramos-Perez, Ramos Perez-Alvarez, Wilfredo Rivera-Colon, Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry, Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo, Julio Gonzalez-Diaz, Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo, Jose A. Ramos-Cruz filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) Modified on 7/18/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICITON & ASSUMING LEGAL REPRESENTATION filed by Dennis J. Cruz-Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #2 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #3 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #4 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #5 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #6 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #7 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #8 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY, #9 Exhibit UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY)(Cruz-Perez, Dennis)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 7/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - January 28, 2019 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 2, 2019 Letter)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer/dispositive motion due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/13/2019. (JG)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until July 2, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 6/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of filing of Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 6/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo) Modified on 6/13/2019 to correct event. (mg).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/6/2019. (ad)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number AU2019CV00149. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6437518), filed by Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Served Summons with Translation, #2 Exhibit 2- - Filed Complaint with Translation)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosado-Arroyo et al v. Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin S. Ramos-Perez
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime A. Ferrer-Irizarry
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rosado-Arroyo
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramos Perez-Alvarez
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruperto Rosario-Montalvo
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Ramos-Cruz
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Gonzalez-Diaz
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Perez-Vargas
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Rivera-Colon
Represented By: Dennis J. Cruz-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goya de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?